IL HR1011 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Resolution Adopted as Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requests President Obama to commission a study to detail the economic impact of the slave trade and the use of slave labor; and how Emancipation, while freeing them of their literal bonds, and ending an immoral practice, did not guarantee equality in education, employment, housing, and access to quality affordable health care; that this study also include an analysis for how reparations for past harms have benefited the ethnic groups that have received them during the course of American history; and a proposal for reparations to the descendants of slaves in America, and how those reparations can help overcome obstacles that still exist today in education, employment, housing, health care, and justice.
Title
STUDY REPARATIONS FOR SLAVERY
Sponsors
Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. Litesa Wallace [D] | Rep. Monique Davis [D] |
Rep. Camille Lilly [D] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Resolution Adopted as Amended |
2016-06-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |