IL HR0968 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges the United States Department of Veterans Affairs to make changes to eligibility for health care through the Veterans Health Administration to allow for a better rules process to assist veterans from the Reserve and National Guard receive the proper health care they have earned for serving in the United States Armed Forces.
Title
USVA - ELIGIBILITY HLTH CARE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-03-03 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 020-000-000 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=968&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0968.htm |