IL HR0234 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-3)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the creation of an environmental justice agenda.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENVIRONMENTAL JUSTICE AGENDA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-06-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-06-22HouseResolution Adopted
2017-05-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-05-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-05-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2017-04-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2017-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-04-27HouseRecommends Be Adopted as Amended Environment; 018-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; 018-000-000
2017-04-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment
2017-04-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2017-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-04-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz
2017-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-04-18HouseAssigned to Environment
2017-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-03-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-03-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback