IL HR0170 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests the U.S. Department of Education exempt Illinois schools from taking the state mandated standardized tests in the spring of 2021.
Title
DEPT OF ED-TEST WAIVER REQUEST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - House - Motion in House (Y: 68 N: 37 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-05-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted 068-037-002 |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 005-003-000 |
2021-04-20 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |