IL HR0134 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President Joe Biden and other federal leaders to designate the 1908 Race Riot Sites in Springfield, Illinois as a national monument to be managed by the National Park Service.
Title
1908 RACE RIOT MONUMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2021-04-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2021-04-28 | House | Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-14 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=134&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0134.htm |