IL HR0112 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urges the State of Illinois to solve its budget crisis with the "1-2-3 Plan".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUDGET - 1-2-3 PLAN

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-09HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Mark Batinick

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback