IL HR0045 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Requests President Trump to commission a study to detail the economic impact of the slave trade and the use of slave labor; and how Emancipation, while freeing them of their literal bonds, and ending an immoral practice, did not guarantee equality in education, employment, housing, and access to quality affordable health care; that this study also include an analysis for how reparations for past harms have benefited the ethnic groups that have received them during the course of American history; and a proposal for reparations to the descendants of slaves in America, and how those reparations can help overcome obstacles that still exist today in education, employment, housing, health care, and justice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STUDY REPARATIONS FOR SLAVERY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-06-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-06-26HouseResolution Adopted as Amended
2017-06-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2017-02-09HouseRecommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 010-001-000
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Restorative Justice Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback