IL HR0038 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-28 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizes that the normal cost of pensions for State educators is the responsibility of the State and that the General Assembly should not use the current budget crisis as a reason to shift its financial responsibility for State pension costs to the local taxpayers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PENSION COST SHIFTING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-28HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-09-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-03-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-02-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2017-02-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-02-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2017-02-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2017-01-24HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-18HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback