IL HR0012 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Declares November 7, 2019 as Victims of Communism Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VICTIMS OF COMMUNISM DAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2019-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-02-27HouseResolution Adopted
2019-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Resolutions
2019-02-20HouseRecommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2019-01-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-12-14HousePrefiled with Clerk by Rep. Thomas M. Bennett

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback