IL HJR0152 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates that the section of Interstate 155 beginning at the Hopedale Exit on Illinois Route 122 and ending at the intersection of Illinois Route 9 as the "Major Reid Nannen Memorial Highway".
Title
MAJ. R. NANNEN MEM HGHWAY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - Motion in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 054-000-001 |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-06-30 | House | Resolution Adopted 111-000-000 |
2016-06-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2016-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2016-05-26 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 018-000-000 |
2016-05-19 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2016-05-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2016-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Butler |