IL HJR0010 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Adopted Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the section of Route 6 in the City of Marseilles that runs from the intersections of Route 6 and Jefferson Street to Route 6 and Main Street as the "SGT Michael J. Vangelisti Memorial Highway".
Title
SGT VANGELISTI MEMORIAL HWY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Motion To Adopt in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Adopted Both Houses |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Resolution Adopted; 053-000-000 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Sue Rezin |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2023-04-26 | House | Resolution Adopted 112-000-000 |
2023-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2023-04-18 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges; 015-000-000 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulations, Roads & Bridges |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |