IL HB5726 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Motor Fuel Tax Law. Provides that, beginning on July 1, 2022, the rate of tax shall be $0.19 per gallon (currently $0.38 per gallon, adjusted each year according to the percentage increase in the Consumer Price Index), plus an additional 2 1/2 cents per gallon for diesel fuel, liquefied natural gas, or propane. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that no tax may be imposed under the Municipal Motor Fuel Tax Law on or after July 1, 2022. Preempts the exercise of home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
MOTOR FUEL TAX-RATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2022-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Adam Niemerg |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 505 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 8-11-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5726&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5726.htm |