IL HB5636 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0694
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Protection and Advocacy for Persons with Developmental Disabilities Act. Provides that the designated agency that administers the State plan to protect and advocate the rights of persons with developmental disabilities under the requirements of the federal Developmental Disabilities Assistance and Bill of Rights Act shall submit to the Department of Human Services an annual report to be made available to the public. Provides that the annual report shall include, but is not limited to: (1) how many visits were made by the designated agency to developmental disability facilities in the year preceding the report; (2) which developmental disability facilities were visited in the year preceding the report; and (3) the nature of each visit, such as meeting with residents and staff of the developmental disability facility, distributing written information to the developmental disability facility, or whether the visit was scheduled or unscheduled, Provides that the designated agency shall have access to community-integrated living arrangements for the purposes of meeting with residents and staff, informing them of services available from the agency, distributing written information about the agency and the rights of persons with developmental disabilities, conducting scheduled and unscheduled visits, and performing other activities designed to protect the rights of persons with developmental disabilities. Effective January 1, 2019.
Title
DESIGNATED AGENCY-DEV D-VISITS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0694 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 005-000-000 |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 40 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |