IL HB5406 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interscholastic Athletic Organization Act. Provides that, for the benefit of the physical and mental health of athletes, beginning in the 2024-2025 school year, all practices, games, or contests by a State high school athletic program or team that is a part of an association or other entity that has, as one of its purposes, promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among high schools and high school students within this State shall meet all specified requirements pertaining to athletic practice time limits. Provides that an association or other entity that has as one of its purposes promoting, sponsoring, regulating, or in any manner providing for interscholastic athletics or any form of athletic competition among schools and students within this State shall enforce a penalty for a State high school athletic program or team exceeding practice maximums, which may include, but are not limited to, a loss of a practice day or other sanctions determined by the Illinois High School Association for each violation and shall be imposed as appropriate to the level, extent, and duration of the penalty. Effective immediately.
Title
HIGH SCHOOL ATHLETICS-PRACTICE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-19 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 009-005-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2024-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne M. Ness |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2024-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2024-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-03-13 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 009-004-001 |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-03-07 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tracy Katz Muhl |
2024-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregg Johnson |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2024-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2024-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-09 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-09 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |