IL HB5318 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-13)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-13)
Status: Passed on June 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1073
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. In provisions concerning cancer screenings, provides that a group policy of accident and health insurance that provides coverage for hospital or medical treatment or services for illness on an expense-incurred basis and is amended, delivered, issued, or renewed after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall provide coverage without imposing a deductible, coinsurance, copayment, or any other cost-sharing requirement on the benefits. Provides for coverage for an annual prostate cancer screening for male insureds. Defines "prostate cancer screening" as medically viable methods for the detection and diagnosis of prostate cancer, including a digital rectal exam and the prostate-specific antigen test and associated laboratory work, and provides that the term includes subsequent follow-up testing as directed by a health care provider, including, but not limited to, urinary analysis, serum biomarkers, and medical imaging.
Title
INS-PROSTATE CANCER SCREENING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-10 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-1073 |
2022-06-10 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-06-10 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2022-03-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Vella |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 010-000-000 |
2022-02-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 012-004-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-28 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356u | Amended Code | Citation Text |