IL HB4452 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961. Creates the offense of possession or transportation of stolen ferrous or nonferrous metal, including but not limited to copper, HVAC components, and catalytic converters. Provides penalties from a Class C misdemeanor to a Class 2 felony. Makes it unlawful to cut, mutilate, deface, or otherwise injure personal or real property for the purpose of obtaining ferrous or nonferrous metal. Provides penalties of a Class 4 or Class 3 felony depending on the value of the property damage involved. A violation that results in disruption of communication or electrical service to critical infrastructure or for more than 10 customers of the service is a Class A misdemeanor. A violation of any provision that results in great bodily harm, permanent disability, disfigurement, or substantial risk of death to another is a Class 1 felony. A violation of any provision that results the death of another is a Class X felony. Provides exemption from civil liability for public or private owners to a person injured during or by a dangerous condition created in an offense or an attempted offense under this Section.
Title
CRIM CD - STOLEN MATERIALS
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Beiser [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Patrick Verschoore [D] | Rep. Karen Yarbrough [D] |
Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth [D] | Rep. John Bradley [D] | Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; by Voice Vote |
2012-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley |
2012-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2012-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry F. Costello, II |
2012-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-30 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |