IL HB4322 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that, before making any decisions on a school closure, a school board (other than the Chicago Board of Education) shall appoint a district advisory committee to advise and make recommendations to the school board about the school closure. Sets forth provisions concerning committee membership, information the committee must gather, and public hearings. Requires the committee to make a recommendation to the school board on school closure, and requires the school board to take into account the committee's recommendation on school closure when making a final decision.
Title
SCH CD-SCH CLOSURE-COMMITTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Remains in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 004-017-000 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-11-09 | House | First Reading |
2015-10-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Margo McDermed |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4322&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4322.htm |