IL HB3744 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that for any project under a construction contract, the contract shall require that, to the extent practicable, at least 10% of man-hours performing construction services be performed by individuals who reside in areas of poverty. Requires the Department of Central Management Services to annually release a list of areas of poverty that meet the requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PRO CD-CONSTRUCT MAN-HOURS REQ

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 63 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenatePursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateDo Pass State Government; 005-002-001
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenatePostponed - State Government
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-27SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 063-053-000
2017-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2017-04-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-21HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-03-16HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-16HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 005-002-000
2017-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2017-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2017-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3050030-40New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback