IL HB3667 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Limits the ability of certain classes of persons to participate in the retirement systems established under the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund (IMRF), State Universities, and Downstate Teachers Articles of the Code. In the State Universities Article, specifies that, in the case of doubt as to whether a person is an employee, the decision of the Board of Trustees of the State Universities Retirement System shall be final. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ELIGIBILITY REFORMS
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kay [R] | Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-09-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2013-08-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dwight Kay |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 15-107 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 16-106 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 7-109 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3667&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB3667.htm |