IL HB3659 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0709
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act. Prohibits employees and members of the Chicago Transit Board from holding any other office or employment under the Federal, State or any County or any municipal government, or any other unit of local government. Makes corresponding changes in the Regional Transportation Authority Act that apply to members serving on the Regional Transportation Authority Board and the Commuter Rail Board. Effective immediately.
Title
CTA-RTA-BOARD MEMBER RESTRICT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0709 |
2014-07-16 | House | Effective Date July 16, 2014 |
2014-07-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2014-05-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2014 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-03-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 25, 2014 |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-03-21 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000 |
2014-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2014-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-06 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Mass Transit Committee; 017-000-000 |
2014-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Mass Transit Committee; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mass Transit Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to Mass Transit Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-10-22 | House | First Reading |
2013-09-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2013-08-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2013-08-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2013-08-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2013-08-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2013-08-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3605 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 3.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3615 | 3B.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |