IL HB3606 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Police Department Non-lethal Force Policy Act. Provides that the Department of State Police, Secretary of State Police Department, mass transit district police force, university police force, county sheriff's office, and each police department of a municipality of this State shall develop a plan or strategy for the use of non-lethal force on a person suspected of committing or having committed a criminal offense or resisting arrest. The plan or strategy shall include the use of new technologies and alternatives to the use of firearms in apprehending a suspect or in protecting the officer from harm by a suspect.
Title
POLICE-NON-LETHAL FORCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3606&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB3606.htm |