IL HB3592 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0488
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Department of Public Health to ensure that medical examiner offices are included as part of medical facilities for the purposes of complying with and implementing specified federal laws.
Title
IDPH-MEDICAL EXAMINER OFFICES
Sponsors
Rep. Lamont Robinson [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] | Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-29 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0488 |
2021-08-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-08-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 28, 2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-001-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |