IL HB3592 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-07 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Community College Act. Provides for legislative findings. Provides that, subject to appropriation, the Illinois Community College Board shall establish a community college apprenticeship grant program to expand opportunities for credit and non-credit education and training leading to high-demand jobs through apprenticeship programs offered in partnership with a community college and a local business or industry. Provides that the grants must be prioritized to expand apprenticeship programs to new populations, develop apprenticeships in new, non-traditional sectors, and identify ways to promote greater inclusion and diversity in apprenticeships. Requires the Illinois Community College Board to adopt rules. Effective immediately.
Title
COMM COLL-APPRENTICE PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |