IL HB3592 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0382
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Retirement Fund Article of the Illinois Pension Code. In a provision concerning payment for purchasing service credit under an early retirement incentive program, changes the required contribution rate from a specified percentage to the total employee contribution rate in effect for the applicable plan at the time the member purchases the service. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-IMRF-EARLY RETMT COST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0382 |
2015-08-17 | House | Effective Date August 17, 2015 |
2015-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-24 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-26 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2015 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Do Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 009-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-29 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 29, 2015 |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-000 |
2015-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-23 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-23 | House | Pension Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-23 | House | Judicial Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-23 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-23 | House | Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2015-04-17 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-17 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-17 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-17 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-16 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2015-03-26 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2015-03-16 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 7-141.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |