IL HB3585 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Hospital Patient Protection Act. Provides for minimum direct care registered professional nurse-to-patient staffing ratios in hospitals, long-term acute care hospitals, and ambulatory surgical treatment centers. Sets forth essential functions of direct care registered professional nurses relating to hospital patient care. Sets forth certain rights of direct care registered professional nurses, including the rights to protected speech and patient advocacy. Prohibits a hospital, long-term acute care hospital, and ambulatory surgical treatment center from interfering with a nurse's exercise of those rights, and prohibits other retaliatory or discriminatory action by a hospital. Provides for monetary and equitable relief for violations of the Act, and provides for civil penalties. Requires a hospital, long-term acute care hospital, and ambulatory surgical treatment center to post certain provisions of the Act for review by the hospital's employees and patients and by the public. Amends the Hospital Licensing Act and the Nurse Practice Act to provide that in the case of a conflict between a provision of either of those Acts and a provision of the Hospital Patient Protection Act, the Hospital Patient Protection Act shall control. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
HOSPITAL PATIENT PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-02-28 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 85 | 2.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
225 | 65 | 50-17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3585&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3585.htm |