IL HB3540 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires the Department of Human Services to provide child care services to all children who are eligible for assistance and are: (A) under age 13; or (B) under age 19 and (i) are under court supervision or (ii) have physical or mental incapacities as documented by a statement from a local health provider or other health professional. Effective July 1, 2017.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CHILD CARE-PROGRAM EXPANSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-06HouseFiscal Note Filed
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-04-06HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-04HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-04-03HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-006-000
2017-03-01HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-10HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-10HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Litesa E. Wallace

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30559A-11Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback