IL HB3332 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates a credit for taxpayers who (i) own residential rental property in the State and (ii) enter into or renew a lease agreement with a qualified renter during the taxable year. Provides that the credit shall be equal to 15% of the annual rent paid to the taxpayer by that qualified renter. Provides that the term "qualified renter" means any person who has been convicted of a crime in this State or any other jurisdiction. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-RENTAL-EX FELONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-03-14 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=3332&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB3332.htm |