IL HB3133 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that no insurer shall specify the use of repair procedures that are not in compliance with original equipment manufacturer directives for those parts in the repair of an insured's motor vehicle, nor shall any repair facility or installer use repair procedures that are not in compliance with original equipment manufacturer directives for those parts to repair a vehicle. Provides that the use of original equipment manufacturer repair parts or original equipment manufacturer advanced driver assistance system calibration tools that may be recommended in an original equipment manufacturer directive are not required if the repair parts or tools used are at least equal in like kind and quality and otherwise conform to original equipment manufacturer directives. Amends the Automotive Collision Repair Act. Provides that an estimate given to a consumer by a motor vehicle collision repair facility shall include the use of repair procedures and replacement parts that are in compliance with original equipment manufacturer directives for those parts. Provides that the use of original equipment manufacturer repair parts or original equipment manufacturer advanced driver assistance system calibration tools that may be recommended in an original equipment manufacturer directive are not required if the repair parts or tools used are at least equal in quality and otherwise conform to original equipment manufacturer directives.
Title
INS-COLLISION REPAIR PROCEDURE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 155.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 308 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |