IL HB2988 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-15)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-15)
Status: Passed on April 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-19 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0004
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. In provisions concerning winds farms and electric-generating wind devices, makes the provisions applicable even if a county has or has not formed a zoning commission and adopted formal zoning. Clarifies that only a county may establish standards for wind farms, electric-generating wind devices, and commercial wind energy facilities in unincorporated areas of the county outside of the zoning jurisdiction of a municipality and the 1.5 mile radius surrounding the zoning jurisdiction of a municipality. Effective immediately.
Title
LOCAL WIND ENERGY REGULATION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 95 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-19 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0004 |
2019-04-19 | House | Effective Date April 19, 2019 |
2019-04-19 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-04-09 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-04-03 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 043-007-001 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 095-012-001 |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-03-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 014-003-000 |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |