IL HB2804 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mechanics Lien Act. Provides that an applicant may at any time file a petition to substitute a bond for the property subject to a lien claim under the Act with the clerk of the circuit court of the county in which the property against which the lien claim is asserted is located, or if there is a pending action to enforce the lien claim, an applicant may timely apply to become a party to the pending action at any time before a final judgment is rendered and file a petition to substitute a bond for the property subject to the lien claim in the pending action. Defines terms. Contains notice and procedural requirements; a statement of legislative intent; and language limiting the applicability of the new provisions.
Title
LIENS: SUBSTITUTION OF BOND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-22 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2804&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2804.htm |