IL HB2723 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning armed violence. Defines a "Category III weapon" as a bludgeon, black-jack, slungshot, sand-bag, sand-club, metal knuckles, billy, or other dangerous weapon or instrument of like character used by the defendant in a similar manner. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-ARMED VIOLENCE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John D. Anthony |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 33A-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2723&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2723.htm |