IL HB2515 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections relating to restitution. Provides that if the defendant is convicted of a violent crime, the court may sentence the defendant to pay lifetime restitution to the crime victim. Provides that the court shall base its decision to order lifetime restitution upon (i) the age of the defendant, (ii) the severity of the crime, and (iii) the income of the defendant.
Title
CD CORR- LIFETIME-RESTITUTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo | |
2010-03-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios | |
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2010-02-23 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-03-12 | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 001-002-000; Lost | |
2009-03-06 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-03-04 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul D. Froehlich | |
2009-02-19 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2515&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2515.htm |