IL HB2437 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-11 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Reinstitutes State funded General Assistance to provide a program for adults with no children to be known as State Transitional Assistance and a program for families with children and for pregnant women to be known as State Family and Children Assistance. Sets forth eligibility requirements for State Transitional Assistance including that an individual must be ineligible for Aid to the Aged, Blind, or Disabled (AABD) benefits and Temporary Assistance for Needy Families (TANF) benefits and must be age 18 or over or married and living with a spouse, regardless of age. Provides that persons who are too impaired to work but do not have a disability that meets the disability level to qualify for Supplemental Security Income or have substantial barriers to being employable shall be considered chronically needy and eligible for State Transitional Assistance. Sets forth other criteria for determining whether an individual is chronically needy. Sets forth the eligibility requirements under the State Family and Children Assistance program including that a family unit must be ineligible for AABD and TANF and must contain a child under the age of 18 or a child age 18 who is a full-time student. Provides that a conviction for a drug-related felony shall not disqualify an applicant for assistance under either program and that, subject to federal approval, the assistance amount provided under either program shall not be considered income for purposes of determining eligibility under the Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program. Effective immediately.
Title
DHS-GENERAL ASSISTANCE
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Flowers [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Latoya Greenwood [D] | Rep. Camille Lilly [D] |
Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2022-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2022-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-04-08 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 015-008-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2022-03-17 | House | Remains in Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-03-17 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 011-009-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2022-02-25 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) February 25, 2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-10-12 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-10-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | To Public Benefits Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 6-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |