IL HB2101 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Changes numerous Sections to provide that a county may deposit public funds into credit unions (currently, only banks or savings and loan associations). Further provides that county moneys may be invested in dividend-bearing share accounts, share certificate accounts, or class of share accounts of a credit union, provided the accounts of that credit union are insured and the credit union's principal office is located within the State of Illinois. Effective immediately.
Title
CNTY CD-FUNDS-CREDIT UNIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Emily McAsey [D] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Marlow Colvin [D] | Rep. Karen Yarbrough [D] |
Sen. Arthur Wilhelmi [D] | Sen. Susan Rezin [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-17 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0129 |
2011-07-14 | House | Effective Date July 14, 2011 |
2011-07-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-15 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-17 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2011 |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2011 |
2011-05-06 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 008-000-000 |
2011-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen A. Yarbrough |
2011-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-023-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2011-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Counties & Townships Committee; by Voice Vote |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2011-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-10009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11006 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11007 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11009 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11010 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11011 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 3-11018 | Amended Code | Citation Text |