IL HB1886 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that within 60 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act, on a date set by the State Board of Education, a special election must be held in each county to elect members to a county school board. Provides that on July 1, 2012, (i) all school districts in this State in existence on June 30, 2012 (other than the Chicago school district) are dissolved; (ii) their school boards are abolished; (iii) the terms of all board members end; and (iv) all of the powers, duties, assets, liabilities, employees, contracts, property, records, pending business, and unexpended funds of each school board are transferred to the appropriate county school board or boards. Provides that on July 1, 2012, each county shall constitute one school district to be governed by a county school board, unless the county school board has divided the county into 2 or more school districts, in which case each of those school districts shall be governed by a school board elected as provided under the Code, and the county school board shall be dissolved upon those school board members taking office. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-DISSOLVE DIST-COUNTY
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-17 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1886&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1886.htm |