IL HB1357 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Landscape Architecture Act of 1989. Replaces all references to "Director" with "Secretary". Provides that failing to respond and provide information to the Department within 30 days of a written request is grounds for discipline (now, 60 days). Provides that the Department may take disciplinary action against any person that commits certain tax violations. Provides that the Department shall deny a license or renewal to a person that has defaulted on an education loan or scholarship provided or guaranteed by the State. Provides that the Department may suspend or revoke a license, or deny a license or renewal, or take any other disciplinary action against a person who is more than 30 days delinquent in the payment of child support if the Department of Healthcare and Family Services has certified the delinquency to the Department. Provides that fines shall not exceed $10,000 for each violation under the Act (now, $1,000). Defines "address of record". Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
IL LANDSCAPE ARCHITECTURE ACT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-13 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1357&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1357.htm |