IL HB1244 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Creates the Rights of Voters Article. Prohibits the imposition or application of a voting qualification, prerequisite, standard, practice, or procedure by the State or any locality in a manner that results in a denial or abridgment of the right of any citizen of the United States to vote based on race, color, or membership in a language minority. Provides that an election authority must provide election materials in the language of a single language minority if the area or part of an area of the election authority has more than 5% of its eligible voters or 10,000 eligible voters who are members of the single language minority and are unable to speak or understand English adequately to participate in the electoral process. Requires notice of certain changes in the election process and allows for a public comment period. Alternatively, allows the county board or board of election commissioners to submit proposed changes to the Attorney General for implementation. Prohibits the use of an at-large method of election in a manner that impairs the ability of members of a protected class to elect candidates of its choice or its ability to influence the outcome of an election. Creates the Voter Education and Outreach Fund as a special fund in the State treasury to deposit all penalties and charges related to violations of the provisions. Allows the Attorney General or a member of a language minority to commence a civil action in response to a violation of the provisions. Makes other changes. Provides that the amendatory Act may be referred to as the Illinois Voting Protection Act.
Title
ELECTIONS-RIGHTS OF VOTERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-02-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kam Buckner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 12-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 17-14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 18-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 29-21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 29-22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 29-23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 29-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | 3A-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
10 | 5 | Art. 3A heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1244&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1244.htm |