IL HB1184 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the South Suburban Airport Authority Act and the South Suburban Airport Authority. Contains provisions concerning governance and finances of the Authority. Provides that the Public Funds Statement Publication Act shall not apply to the Authority. Amends the Archaeological and Paleontological Resources Protection Act, the Human Skeletal Remains Protection Act, the Governmental Account Audit Act, the Illinois Municipal Code, the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act, the Vital Records Act, the Religious Freedom Restoration Act, and the Eminent Domain Act to make conforming changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective March 1, 2011.
Title
SOUTH SUBURBAN AIRPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Susana A. Mendoza | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay C. Hoffman | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Holbrook | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-02-26 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2009-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emily McAsey | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1184&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB1184.htm |