IL HB1017 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Creates a traffic ticket fine waiver program available to a defendant who is in default or is unable to pay required fines, fees, costs, or court assessments, or who has a suspended driver's license, resulting from a minor traffic offense under the Code or a similar provision of a local ordinance. Provides that, upon submission of the application to enter into the program, the court shall grant the defendant (1) the ability to convert the amount due into court-approved public community service; or (2) a partial obligation waiver. Provides that the program shall apply only to a defendant convicted of a minor traffic offense committed no earlier than 2 years before the effective date. Defines "minor traffic offense". Makes conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-FINE WAIVER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2023-01-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-12 | House | First Reading |
2022-12-19 | House | Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 16-104e | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 16-109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 6-204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |