IL HB0825 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Creates the offense of criminal distribution of a suicide depiction. Defines "person committing suicide" as a person under 18 years of age or a person with a severe or profound intellectual disability engaged in any act with the intent to commit suicide and which constitutes a substantial step toward commission of suicide and the act results in the person's suicide. Provides that a person commits the offense when he or she knowingly: (1) sells, delivers, or provides or offers or agrees to sell, deliver, or provide an audio or video depiction of a person committing suicide; (2) publishes, exhibits, or otherwise makes available an audio or video depiction of a person committing suicide; (3) creates, buys, procures, or possesses an audio or video depiction of a person committing suicide with intent to disseminate it in violation of this provision, or in violation of the penal laws, rules, or regulations of any other jurisdiction; or (4) advertises or otherwise promotes the sale of an audio or video depiction of a person committing suicide. Establishes affirmative defenses. Provides that a violation is a Class A misdemeanor for a first offense and a Class 4 felony for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
CRIM CD-SUICIDE VIDEO DISTRIB
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Chad Hays [R] | Rep. David Olsen [R] | Rep. Nicholas Sauer [R] |
Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2017-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2017-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2017-02-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2017-01-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=825&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0825.htm |