IL HB0481 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-24 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0297
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Nursing Home Care Act, MC/DD Act, and ID/DD Community Care Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall allow an individual to satisfy a specified supervised clinical experience requirement through supervised clinical experience at an assisted living establishment licensed under the Assisted Living and Shared Housing Act.
Title
NURSE AIDE REGISTRY-TRAINING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-24 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0297 |
2017-08-24 | House | Effective Date August 24, 2017 |
2017-08-24 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 016-000-000 |
2017-03-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 45 | 3-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 46 | 3-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 47 | 3-206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |