IL HB0454 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cigarette Tax Act and the Cigarette Use Tax Act. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2009, an additional tax of 50 mills per cigarette ($1 per package of 20) shall be imposed. Effective immediately.
Title
CIGARETTE TAX INCREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-09 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-04 | First Reading | |
2009-02-04 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaShawn K. Ford |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=454&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB0454.htm |