IL HB0439 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Creates a pilot program for DuPage County that allows the election authority to obtain a driver's license picture and signature to help verify a voter's identity. Removes provisions that provide that an unregistered qualified elector may register to vote or a registered voter may submit a change of address form at any other early voting site beginning 15 days prior to the election, and provides that registration or changes to address may be submitted at a permanent polling place (rather than a polling place). Provides that certain election authorities may opt out of registration in the polling place if, among other requirements, the election authority establishes grace period registration and voting at a polling place in each municipality where 20% or more of the county's registered voters (rather than residents) reside. Requires any individual challenging the validity of petitions to notify the applicable election authority when a challenge is filed in court contesting the decision of the election authority. Provides that votes by mail may be processed as they arrive in the mail and that election authorities shall have more than 15 days to process votes by mail. Removes a provision that provides that any person entitled to vote early by personal appearance may do so at any polling place established for early voting. Effective immediately.
Title
ELEC CD-OMNIBUS
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Elections & Campaign Finance Committee; Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2018-03-21 | House | To Election Administration Subcommittee |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | To Election Administration Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 19-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 19A-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 20-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 4-16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 4-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-23 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 5-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 6-53 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=439&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB0439.htm |