IL HB0314 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0017
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the General Assembly for its FY10 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.
Title
$GEN ASSEMBLY-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 62 N: 51 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0017 | |
2009-06-26 | Effective Date June 26, 2009 | |
2009-06-26 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard P. Myers | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David R. Leitch | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rich Brauer | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ronald A. Wait | |
2009-05-31 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-05-31 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 017-000-000 | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry L. Mitchell | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert F. Flider | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frank J. Mautino | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz | |
2009-05-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2009-05-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Careen M. Gordon | |
2009-05-30 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2009-05-30 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-05-30 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. John E. Bradley | |
2009-05-29 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-29 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-28 | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Forby | |
2009-05-28 | Recalled to Second Reading | |
2009-05-28 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-05-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Appropriations II; 008-000-000 | |
2009-05-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations II | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Gary Forby | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 30, 2009 | |
2009-03-26 | Do Pass Appropriations II; 010-001-000 | |
2009-03-19 | Assigned to Appropriations II | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-19 | First Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-19 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-19 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 062-051-000 | |
2009-03-19 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-19 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-02-27 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael J. Madigan | |
2009-02-24 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-24 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-02-19 | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 005-002-000 | |
2009-02-04 | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee | |
2009-01-23 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-01-23 | First Reading | |
2009-01-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Gary Hannig |