IL HB0256 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Limited Liability Company Act. Reduces filing fees imposed upon limited liability companies by 50%. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LLC-REDUCE FEES 50%

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2015-02-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2015-02-20HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2015-02-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2015-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2015-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2015-02-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2015-01-23HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-01-23HouseFirst Reading
2015-01-23HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
80518050-10Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback