IL HB0256 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Budget Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Requires the Governor's budget to include projections of revenues and expenditures for the 5 following fiscal years. Sets forth requirements for the projections. Requires the budget for the next fiscal year separately to set forth new or expanded expenditures of $1,000,000 or more. Requires the Governor's Office of Management and Budget to review previous projections and compare them to actual revenues and expenditures. Requires the Governor to submit 5-year projections for expenditures not included in the Governor's initial budget before the General Assembly approves appropriation bills. Contains other provisions. Amends the Fiscal Note Act to require a 5-year projection of expenditures if the note indicates an increase of expenditures of $1,000,000 or more. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BUDGET/LONG-TERM PLANNING

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2011-03-17HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2011-03-07HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2011-03-03HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias
2011-01-25HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2011-01-25HouseFirst Reading
2011-01-24HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Rosemary Mulligan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152050-30New CodeSee Bill Text
25501Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback