IL HB0164 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Funds Investment Act. Authorizes a forest preserve district subject to the provisions of the Downstate Forest Preserve District Act to invest its public funds in interest bearing bonds of any county, township, city, village, incorporated town, municipal corporation, or school district, of the State of Illinois, of any other state, or of any political subdivision or agency of the State of Illinois or of any other state, whether the interest earned thereon is taxable or tax-exempt under federal law. Effective immediately.
Title
PUB FUNDS-FOREST PRESERVES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Tabled |
2013-03-15 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2013-03-15 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-02-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-02-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-02-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2013-02-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 005-000-000 |
2013-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2013-01-30 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2013-01-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 235 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |