ID SJM110 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-13 - Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
COLUMBIA-SNAKE RIVER SYSTEM -- Stating findings of the Legislature, opposing the removal or breaching of the dams on the Columbia-Snake River System and its tributaries, and recognizing certain benefits provided by the Port of Lewiston.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature, opposing the removal or breaching of the dams on the Columbia-Snake River System and its tributaries, and recognizing certain benefits provided by the Port of Lewiston.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Secretary of State |
2020-03-13 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2020-03-11 | House | to Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Title apvd |
2020-03-11 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- ADOPTED 61-3-6 |
2020-03-10 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-09 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-03-06 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, March 9, 2020 |
2020-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-02-27 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2020-02-27 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Read in full -- ADOPTED -- voice vote |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |