ID SCR116 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-12 - Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AGRICULTURE - RULE REJECTED - Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture relating to Rules Governing the Importation of Animals.
Title
Stating findings of the Legislature and rejecting a certain rule docket of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture relating to Rules Governing the Importation of Animals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2015-03-12 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-11 | Senate | ADOPTED -- voice vote -Engelking |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read in full |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to 10th order; held one legislative day |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2015/SCR116.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2015/SCR116.pdf |