ID S1343 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 267 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 267 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PAROLE - Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding allegations of a violation of parole conditions.
Title
Amends existing law to revise a provision regarding allegations of a violation of parole conditions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor on 03/30/16 Session Law Chapter 267 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported delivered to Governor at 10:45 a.m. on 03/24/16 |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Reported signed by the Speaker & ordered delivered to Governor |
2016-03-23 | House | Received from Senate; Signed by Speaker; Returned to Senate |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Reported enrolled; signed by President; to House for signature of Speaker |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Returned From House Passed; referred to enrolling |
2016-03-22 | House | to Senate |
2016-03-22 | House | Title apvd |
2016-03-22 | House | PASSED -- 68-2-0 |
2016-03-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-03-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-03-11 | House | Read First Time, Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration |
2016-03-11 | House | Received from the Senate, Filed for First Reading |
2016-03-10 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-10 | Senate | PASSED -- 31-3-1 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported Printed; referred to Judiciary & Rules |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Introduced; read first time; referred to JR for Printing |